+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 26, 2004 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Housing and Urban Development Committee; 014-000-000
On May 12, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Housing and Urban Development Committee
On May 30, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 28, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Julie Hamos
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor