+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 1, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 006-000-000
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 International Trade & Commerce Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
- Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
+ − Vote
May 24, 2019: HR0385 - International Trade & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor