+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor