+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Veterans Affairs Committee; 009-000-000
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On May 28, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor