+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 016-000-000
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Removes the Department of Veterans Affairs from the list of agencies urged to develop a basic protocol to provide direction on how to make medications available to veterans suffering from mental illnesses. Adds language directing the chair and the minority spokesman of the House Veterans' Affairs Committee to monitor the preparations of such a protocol and periodically make reports to the House of Representatives, the Office of the Governor, the director of the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, and the director of the Department of Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor