+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 010-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
- Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Vote
May 16, 2019: HR0362 - Adoption & Child Welfare
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor