+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor