+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 008-000-000
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis