+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 18, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 021-003-001
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Read in Full a First Time
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.