+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
+ − Vote
April 29, 2015: HR0333 - Higher Education - Apr 29, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor