+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 29, 2005 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor