+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 31, 2011 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 112-002-001
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams
+ − Vote
May 31, 2011: HR0325 - Tuesday, May 31, 2011
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor