+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 073-042-000
- Recommends Be Adopted Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 005-003-000
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
+ − Vote
May 24, 2021: HR0318 - Immigration & Human Rights Committe
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor