+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 15, 2007
- Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 112-000-000
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Veterans Affairs Committee; 008-000-000
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael K. Smith
+ − Vote
April 19, 2007: HJR0030 - Thursday, April 19, 2007
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor