+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 112-000-000
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2017: HJR0030
March 15, 2017: HJR0030 - Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor