+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 30, 2005 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 114-000-000
On May 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On May 17, 2005 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On May 10, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lovana Jones
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles E. Jefferson
+ − Vote
May 30, 2005: HR0299 - Monday, May 30, 2005
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor