+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 17, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Tryon
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor