+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 117-000-000
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 009-000-000
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard