+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 26, 2007 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On July 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions July 26, 2007
- Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
- Waive Posting Notice
On July 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On June 5, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 100-000-000
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Veterans Affairs Committee; 011-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Stephens
+ − Votes (2)
July 26, 2007: HJR0028 - Motion To Adopt - Thursday, July 26, 2007
June 5, 2007: HJR0028 - Tuesday, June 05, 2007
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor