+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 020-000-000
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor