+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 29, 2013
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Re-referred to Assignments
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 116-000-000
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 011-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Deletes everything after the heading. Reinserts the contents of the resolution, but resolves that the State Board of Education shall provide all necessary support to the Task Force (instead of resolving that the Task Force shall be provided technical and staffing support by the Commission on Government and Financial Accountability and that the Teacher's Retirement System of the State of Illinois shall provide all necessary support to the Task Force in coordination with Commission on Government and Financial Accountability).
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2013: HJR0027 - Motion To Adopt - Thursday, May 30, 2013
May 1, 2013: HJR0027 - Wednesday, May 01, 2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor