+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 28, 2003 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 116-000-000
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Environment and Energy Committee; 011-000-000
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment and Energy Committee
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia