+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 063-045-000
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 071-043-000
- Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 007-003-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2021: HR0254
May 26, 2021: HR0254 - International Trade & Commerce
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor