+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Energy Committee; 006-003-001
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Energy Committee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David B. Reis
+ − Vote
April 20, 2015: HR0243 - Energy - Apr 20, 2015
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor