+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-002-000
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
+ − Vote
May 8, 2019: HR0241 - State Government Administration
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor