+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 26, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000
- Adopted Both Houses
On July 25, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
On June 18, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On June 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended
On June 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Deanna Demuzio
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Be Adopted as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions June 15, 2007
On June 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 112-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 022-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Changes the date by which the task force must report its findings and recommendations from January 1, 2008 to August 1, 2008.
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Changes the date by which the task force must report its findings and recommendations from January 1, 2008 to August 1, 2008.
+ − Votes (2)
July 26, 2007: SCA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, July 26, 2007
May 18, 2007: HJR0024 - Friday, May 18, 2007
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor