+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 117-000-000
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Tryon