+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 31, 2011 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 112-002-001
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 012-000-000
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Vote
May 31, 2011: HR0227 - Tuesday, May 31, 2011
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor