+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 028-000-000
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
+ − Vote
April 30, 2019: HR0221 - Energy & Environment
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor