+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 26, 2007 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On July 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 052-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions July 26, 2007
- Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
- Waive Posting Notice
On July 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On July 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 112-000-000
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted as Amended State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Shane Cultra
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Chapin Rose
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Requires the Task Force to report to the General Assembly no later than July 1, 2008 (rather than no later than July 1, 2007).
+ − Votes (2)
July 26, 2007: HJR0022 - Motion To Adopt - Thursday, July 26, 2007
April 19, 2007: HJR0022 - Thursday, April 19, 2007
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor