+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Vote
May 12, 2021: HR0219 - State Government Administration
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor