+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 14, 2015
- Be Adopted Transportation; 016-000-000
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 110-000-000
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 018-000-000
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rich Brauer