+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 30, 2003 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000
On May 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2003
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Re-referred to Rules
On May 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 114-000-000
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Local Government Committee; 019-000-000
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On March 4, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Osterman
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2003: HJR0021 - Motion To Adopt - Friday, May 30, 2003
May 21, 2003: HJR0021 - Wednesday, May 21, 2003
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor