+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- To Informed Consent Subcommittee
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor