+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 107-000-000
On April 14, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Renee Kosel
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Calvin L. Giles
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell
+ − Vote
April 15, 2005: HR0201 - Friday, April 15, 2005
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor