+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-000-000
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
+ − Vote
April 20, 2015: HR0201 - Labor & Commerce Committee - Apr 20, 2015
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor