+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 110-001-000
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2021: HR0195
April 28, 2021: HR0195 - Revenue & Finance
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor