+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
+ − Vote
April 20, 2015: HR0184 - Human Services - Apr 20, 2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor