+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 059-000-000
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 7, 2019
- Be Adopted Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
- Arrive in Senate
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 112-000-000
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 008-000-000
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi