+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 012-000-000
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Removes references to specific streaming services. Adds language encouraging parents and legal guardians to report harmful content.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2019: HFA0001 - Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT
May 9, 2019: HR0178 - Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor