+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 117-000-000
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 015-000-000
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
+ − Vote
May 14, 2003: HR0176 - Wednesday, May 14, 2003
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor