+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 012-000-000
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady
+ − Vote
April 21, 2015: HR0174 - State Government Administration - Apr 21, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor