+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Youth & Young Adults; 007-004-000
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Youth & Young Adults
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis
+ − Vote
March 5, 2015: HR0166 - Youth & Young Adults - Mar 05, 2015
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor