+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 016-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
+ − Vote
April 27, 2021: HR0163 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor