+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended 113-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Kevin Joyce
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Aging Committee; 012-000-000
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Aging Committee
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 31, 2008: HJR0016 - Saturday, May 31, 2008
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor