+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 29, 2005 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On April 28, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 27, 2005 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 23, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson