+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2006 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On November 29, 2006 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000
On November 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions November 29, 2006
- Be Adopted State Government; 007-000-000
On November 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On November 15, 2006 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 116-000-000
On November 14, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 023-000-000
On November 6, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
On November 1, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On September 14, 2006 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Watson
+ − Votes (2)
November 29, 2006: HJR0141 - Motion To Adopt - Wednesday, November 29, 2006
November 15, 2006: HJR0141 - Wednesday, November 15, 2006
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor