+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 30, 2003 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 059-000-000
On May 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2003
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Re-referred to Rules
On May 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Arrive in Senate
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 114-000-000
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Place Calendar Resolutions - Short Debate
- Recommends Be Adopted / Short Debate Aging Committee; 013-000-000
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Aging Committee
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack McGuire
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2003: HJR0014 - Motion To Adopt - Friday, May 30, 2003
May 9, 2003: HJR0014 - Friday, May 09, 2003
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor