+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 16, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On November 15, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-004-000
On November 9, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
+ − Vote
November 15, 2016: HR1349 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor