+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Youth & Young Adults; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Youth & Young Adults; by Voice Vote
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Youth & Young Adults
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Youth & Young Adults
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces the word "unemployment" in numerous places with "employment".
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2015: HR0133 - Youth & Young Adults - Mar 12, 2015
March 12, 2015: HCA0001 - Youth & Young Adults - Mar 12, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor